Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/04/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/04/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/10/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/10/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/10/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/14/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/16/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/22/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/22/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/10/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/10/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/16/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/22/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/22/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/22/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/06/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/06/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/06/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 11/18/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/15/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/15/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 12/15/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/15/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 01/26/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 01/26/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/26/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/26/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 01/26/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/04/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/25/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/16/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/19/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/19/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/20/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/26/2010