Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/09/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/08/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 07/09/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/23/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/29/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/30/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/02/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/15/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/20/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/22/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/08/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/12/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/12/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/03/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/03/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/16/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/12/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/14/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/15/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/28/2010