Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/10/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/10/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/10/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/10/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/10/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/10/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/14/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/14/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/04/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/21/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/23/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/29/2010