Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/10/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/10/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/17/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 09/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/17/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/17/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/17/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/29/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/29/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/29/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/01/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/01/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/08/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/22/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/22/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/22/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/10/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 12/10/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/10/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 12/10/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 12/16/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 01/13/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/21/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/25/2010