Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/21/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/21/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/03/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/03/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/04/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/07/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/13/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/13/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/13/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/17/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/20/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/22/2010