Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/21/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/03/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/16/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/26/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/26/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/08/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/29/2009