Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 05/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/19/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/20/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/20/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/20/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/21/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/03/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/03/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/04/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/04/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/04/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/08/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/08/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/08/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/09/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/09/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/09/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/10/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/10/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/10/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/10/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/11/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/11/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/15/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/15/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/17/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/17/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/17/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/18/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/19/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/07/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/08/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/14/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/20/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/21/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/28/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/08/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/14/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/22/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/23/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/24/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/25/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/01/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/06/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/07/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/07/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/08/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/08/2009