Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/19/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/12/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/12/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/12/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/18/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/18/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/31/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 09/30/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/16/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/17/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/14/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/12/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/12/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/13/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/18/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/18/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/18/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/19/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/19/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/19/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/19/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/25/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/08/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/08/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/17/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/22/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/29/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/29/2010