Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 05/19/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 05/19/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/20/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/20/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/20/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/20/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/20/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/20/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/20/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/20/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/20/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/20/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/20/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/20/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/20/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/20/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/21/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/21/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/21/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/02/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/02/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/02/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/04/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/10/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/17/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/08/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/16/2009