Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/18/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/18/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/18/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/18/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/10/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/10/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 06/10/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/10/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/26/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/29/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/29/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/22/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/22/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/22/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/18/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/18/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/02/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/20/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/20/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/11/2010