Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/14/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/04/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/04/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/12/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/12/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/12/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/12/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/12/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 06/25/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/14/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/22/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/22/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/24/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/27/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/09/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/09/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/23/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/02/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/27/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/12/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/05/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/29/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/29/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/22/2010