Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/13/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/18/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/02/2009