Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/06/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/13/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/13/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/13/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/13/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/13/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/21/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/21/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/11/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/17/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/08/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/10/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/24/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/24/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/13/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/06/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/28/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/10/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/29/2010