Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/07/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/02/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/06/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/14/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/15/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/15/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/15/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/21/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/21/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/21/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/21/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/22/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/22/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/23/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/23/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/26/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/26/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/26/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/27/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/27/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/28/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/28/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/28/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/29/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/29/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/29/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/05/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/05/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/17/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/17/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/01/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/18/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/18/2010