Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/09/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/09/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/09/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/21/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/21/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/26/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/21/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/30/2010