Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/12/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/12/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/02/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/09/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/10/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/11/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/15/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/14/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/17/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/27/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/08/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/07/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/26/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/29/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/02/2009