Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/30/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/23/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/07/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/13/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/13/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/13/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/23/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/23/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/23/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/23/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/24/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/31/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/14/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/14/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/14/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/25/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/13/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 12/01/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/01/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/08/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/10/2009