Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/09/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/09/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/24/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/10/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/10/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/10/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/10/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/10/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/13/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/28/2009