Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/27/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/02/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/02/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/03/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/09/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/16/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/15/2009