Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/05/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/13/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/30/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew