Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/27/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/27/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/28/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/30/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/05/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/05/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/05/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/07/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/07/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/07/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/07/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/07/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/13/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/13/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/13/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/13/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/13/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/13/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/13/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/13/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/04/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/04/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/10/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/08/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 11/02/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/17/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/17/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/02/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 12/15/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 12/15/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/12/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/13/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/19/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/19/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/19/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/26/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/26/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/28/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/08/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/08/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 06/10/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/24/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/29/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/14/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/20/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/30/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/17/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/07/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/09/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 12/14/2010