Refine your search

Date Major Actions
08/16/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-232.
08/16/2010 Signed by President.
08/10/2010 Presented to President.
08/02/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/02/2010 Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6594)
09/09/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 1 (Roll no. 691).(text: CR H9363-9364)
04/23/2009 Introduced in House