Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/28/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/15/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/24/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/01/2009