Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/27/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/27/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/28/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/28/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/28/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/05/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/12/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/19/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/20/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/02/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/04/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/24/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/10/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/31/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/09/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/22/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/23/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/06/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/13/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/29/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/15/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/15/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/20/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 02/02/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/04/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/15/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/21/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/23/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/23/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/24/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/24/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/28/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/28/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/28/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/06/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/06/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/11/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/11/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/12/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/13/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/18/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/18/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/20/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/20/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/24/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/24/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/24/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/27/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/08/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/09/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/17/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 06/23/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/23/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/23/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/24/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/13/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/14/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/19/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/29/2010