Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/15/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/15/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/15/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/22/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/22/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/10/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/12/2009