Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/30/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/12/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/21/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/04/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/04/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/17/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/17/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/26/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/26/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/10/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/10/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/28/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/28/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/28/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/28/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/31/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/10/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/23/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/15/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/20/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/20/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/01/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/01/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/01/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/07/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 12/07/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/11/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/19/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/19/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/15/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/15/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/22/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/25/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/10/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/17/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/24/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/21/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/30/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/23/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/22/2010