Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/22/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/22/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/22/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/22/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/07/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/07/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/07/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/20/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/20/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/20/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/11/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/11/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/18/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/18/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/18/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/17/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/17/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/24/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/24/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/15/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/21/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/21/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/23/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/25/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/14/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/29/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/06/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/18/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/18/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/18/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/18/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/18/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/18/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/18/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/24/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/24/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/24/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/29/2010