Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 04/22/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/24/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/16/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/20/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/27/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/31/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/20/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/23/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 12/10/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 12/15/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/24/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/28/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 06/16/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/14/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/29/2010