Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/05/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/06/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/11/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 05/11/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/11/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/11/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/11/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/15/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/15/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/15/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/19/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/02/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/02/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/08/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/08/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/09/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/10/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/10/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/15/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/16/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/16/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/18/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/18/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/23/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/23/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/24/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/24/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/08/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/08/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/08/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/09/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/09/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/10/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/10/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/13/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/13/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/13/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/14/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/14/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/14/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/15/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/22/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/24/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/24/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/27/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/30/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/08/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/08/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/08/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 09/22/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/22/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/24/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/29/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/29/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/29/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/30/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/01/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 10/01/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/06/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/06/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/13/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/13/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/20/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/22/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 10/27/2009