Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/14/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/04/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/22/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/28/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/06/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/22/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/22/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/06/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/18/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/13/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/10/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/15/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/15/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/22/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/22/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/22/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/22/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/22/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/14/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/16/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/23/2010