Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/03/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/03/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/03/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/03/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/23/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/23/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/23/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/23/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/23/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/23/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/02/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/02/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/02/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/02/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/02/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/10/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/10/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/10/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/10/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/10/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/18/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/18/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/18/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/23/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/23/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/23/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/23/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/25/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/25/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/25/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/25/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/30/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 03/31/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/31/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/02/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/22/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/23/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/23/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/28/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/28/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/28/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/29/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/30/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/05/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/05/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/06/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/07/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/12/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/12/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/13/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/18/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/18/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/03/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/03/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/09/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/09/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/10/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/23/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/23/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/08/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/14/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/14/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/14/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/16/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 07/16/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/27/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/29/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 09/09/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/06/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/26/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 11/05/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 11/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/18/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 12/19/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/26/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/22/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/22/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/09/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/10/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/11/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/12/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/20/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/13/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/04/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/12/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 05/25/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/25/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/28/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/08/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/10/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/15/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/17/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/23/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/30/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/14/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/27/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/27/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/29/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/30/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/30/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/28/2010