Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/16/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/29/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/15/2010