Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/30/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/07/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/19/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/19/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/12/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/18/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/24/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/09/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/13/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 12/10/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/10/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/10/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/10/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/11/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/14/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/16/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/20/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/26/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/27/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/03/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/03/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/04/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/10/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/10/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/17/2010