Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/21/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/21/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/02/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/15/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/13/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/08/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/10/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/23/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/23/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/13/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/20/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/01/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/03/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/14/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/28/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/15/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/15/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/17/2010