Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/02/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 04/02/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/28/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/28/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/28/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/28/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/28/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/15/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/15/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/09/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/09/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/09/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/09/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/09/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/09/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/15/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/15/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/18/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/08/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/08/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/23/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/15/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/15/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/15/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/30/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/30/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/30/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/30/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/30/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 11/03/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/05/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/05/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/06/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/16/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 01/19/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/25/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/25/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/25/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/21/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/26/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/16/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/16/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/16/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/29/2010