Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/21/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/14/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/26/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/30/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/16/2010