Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/21/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/21/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/21/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/22/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/22/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/22/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/22/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/22/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/22/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/22/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/23/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/23/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/23/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/23/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/23/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/27/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/27/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/27/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/27/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/27/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/27/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/27/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/27/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/27/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/27/2009