Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/23/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/29/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/29/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/07/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/07/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/14/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/14/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/14/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/03/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/03/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/03/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/09/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/11/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/11/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/11/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/15/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/16/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/17/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/17/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/26/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/07/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/08/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/08/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/09/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/10/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/23/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/27/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/28/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/08/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/08/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/14/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/06/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/08/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/21/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/16/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/04/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/25/2010