Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/21/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/28/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/28/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/28/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/28/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/12/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/12/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/04/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/04/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/16/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/16/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/16/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/16/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/16/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/25/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/25/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/25/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 06/25/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/25/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/25/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/25/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 06/25/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/25/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 06/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/25/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/09/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 07/21/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/21/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/21/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/21/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/21/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/14/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/14/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/14/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/14/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/14/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 10/06/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/06/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/23/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 10/23/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/23/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/23/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/03/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/02/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 02/02/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/24/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/24/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/24/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/24/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/24/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/24/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/24/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/24/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/24/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/24/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/24/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/04/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/04/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/12/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/26/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/26/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/26/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 11/17/2010