Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/23/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/23/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/23/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/23/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/29/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/29/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/29/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/29/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/29/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/29/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/05/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/05/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/05/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/06/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/07/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/13/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/13/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/13/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/13/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/13/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/13/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/13/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/13/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/13/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/13/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/13/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/13/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/13/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/14/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/14/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/14/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/14/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/14/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/14/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/14/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/14/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/14/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/14/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/14/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/14/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/14/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/14/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/14/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/14/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/14/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/21/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/03/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/03/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/10/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/07/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/08/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/08/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/20/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/22/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/22/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/29/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/29/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/29/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/10/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/10/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/10/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/10/2009