Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 06/17/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/19/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/26/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/28/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/02/2009

Show cosponsors who withdrew