Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/02/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/04/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/17/2009