Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/02/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/02/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/02/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/02/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/02/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/04/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/11/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/10/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/17/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/30/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/30/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/03/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/03/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/03/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/25/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/15/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/16/2010