Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/21/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/21/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/28/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/30/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/05/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/05/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/07/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/21/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/08/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/08/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/12/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/16/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/10/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/21/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/15/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/27/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/29/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 11/06/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/03/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/03/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/26/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/18/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/13/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/18/2010