Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 04/01/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/01/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/21/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/21/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/21/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 04/27/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/27/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/28/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/30/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/05/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/05/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/05/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/07/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/21/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/08/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/08/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/10/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/12/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/12/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/16/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/10/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/21/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/10/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/15/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/22/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/06/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/21/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/26/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/27/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/29/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/29/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 10/29/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/29/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/29/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/29/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/03/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/03/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/04/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 11/06/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/16/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/03/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 12/03/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/03/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/03/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/03/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/13/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/26/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 02/26/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 02/26/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/03/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/17/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/17/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/18/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/22/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/13/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/01/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/13/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/18/2010