Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/26/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/26/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/26/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/22/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/28/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/04/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/28/2009