Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/25/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/25/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/30/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/04/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/19/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/10/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/17/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/23/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/08/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/08/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/08/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/15/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/17/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/20/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/20/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/22/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/22/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/28/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/28/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/28/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/08/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/16/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/16/2009