Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/24/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/02/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/22/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/22/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/27/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/04/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/04/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/20/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/20/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/20/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/02/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/11/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/11/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/24/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/20/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/20/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/20/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/20/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/20/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/22/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/24/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/31/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/09/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/10/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/16/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/22/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/06/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/15/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/12/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/03/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/24/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/24/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/30/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/20/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/20/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/20/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/30/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/14/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/14/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/02/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/02/2010