Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/26/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/26/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/26/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/03/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/01/2010