Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/19/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/26/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/26/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/01/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/22/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/23/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/07/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/07/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/12/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/12/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/14/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/19/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/19/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/21/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/21/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/21/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/21/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/02/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/04/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/12/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/12/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/19/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/24/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/26/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/10/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/10/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/10/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/10/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/10/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/13/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/13/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/14/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/14/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/15/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/16/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/20/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/20/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 07/24/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/24/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/31/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/22/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/01/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/01/2009
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 12/08/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/25/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/02/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/15/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/19/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/15/2010